MI HB4135 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Assigned Pa 100'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Assigned Pa 100'19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; youthful trainees; age eligibility for youthful trainee status; raise to 18 years. Amends sec. 11, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.11).
Title
Criminal procedure; youthful trainees; age eligibility for youthful trainee status; raise to 18 years. Amends sec. 11, ch. II of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 762.11).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 253 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 57 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 57 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned Pa 100'19 |
2019-11-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/31/2019 01:46 Pm |
2019-11-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/31/2019 09:20 Am |
2019-10-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/21/2019 02:19 Pm |
2019-10-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-10-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 253 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-10-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-04-25 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed Roll Call # 57 Yeas 102 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/06/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |