MI HB4087 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Bill Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Law enforcement: state police; emergency materials and supplies reserve; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 390 (MCL 30.401 - 30.421) by adding sec. 7b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement: state police; emergency materials and supplies reserve; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 390 (MCL 30.401 - 30.421) by adding sec. 7b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 385 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-10-14HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
2021-10-14SenateInserted Full Title
2021-10-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 385 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-10-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-10-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-07-15SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-06-30HouseTransmitted
2021-06-30HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 Yeas 97 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-06-30HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-30HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-30HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2021-06-30HouseRead A Second Time
2021-05-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-05-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2021-02-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2021
2021-02-02HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-02-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4087
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4087.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4087.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4087.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4087-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4087-AA23A322.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4087-627173CD.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4087-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4087-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-27-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-30-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-14-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback