MI HB4049 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health: diseases; authority to close certain schools to in-person instruction and prohibit certain sporting events in emergency orders issued in response to an epidemic; modify. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453) & adds sec. 2453a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health: diseases; authority to close certain schools to in-person instruction and prohibit certain sporting events in emergency orders issued in response to an epidemic; modify. Amends secs. 2253 & 2453 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.2253 & 333.2453) & adds sec. 2453a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 21 (Y: 60 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseRe-referred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-03-09HouseVetoed By The Governor 03/09/2021
2021-03-04HousePresented To The Governor 03/08/2021 03:00 Pm
2021-03-03HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-03-03HouseFull Title Agreed To
2021-03-03HouseSenate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 21 Yeas 60 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-03-03HouseRule Suspended
2021-03-03HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-03-03HouseReturned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2021-03-02SenateInserted Full Title
2021-03-02SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 37 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-03-02SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-03-02SenateRules Suspended
2021-03-02SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s)
2021-03-02SenateAmendment(s) Concurred In
2021-03-02SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s)
2021-03-02SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2021-03-02SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2021-02-09SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted
2021-02-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-02-04HouseRead A Third Time
2021-02-04HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-02-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-02-04HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-02-04HouseRead A Second Time
2021-02-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-02-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-01-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2021
2021-01-27HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-01-27HouseRead A First Time
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4049
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4049.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4049.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4049.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4049.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4049-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4048-2ED8B0AD.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4049-3098B564.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4049-F799C17A.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4049-C1E485BD.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4049-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4049-B7AD2F68.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4049-C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4049-2E853AEF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-02-03-006.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-02-04-007.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-03-02-017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-03-018.htm

Bill Comments

feedback