MI HB4037 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid: fiscal year appropriations; requirement for certain assessments; eliminate. Amends sec. 104b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1704b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4038'21
Title
School aid: fiscal year appropriations; requirement for certain assessments; eliminate. Amends sec. 104b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1704b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4038'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 378 Yeas 72 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-01-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |