MI HB4011 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: other; legislative open records act (LORA); create as part of the freedom of information act. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding pt. 2. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4007'19, HB 4008'19, HB 4014'19, HB 4016'19, HB 4009'19, HB 4012'19, HB 4013'19, HB 4010'19, HB 4015'19
Title
Civil rights: other; legislative open records act (LORA); create as part of the freedom of information act. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding pt. 2. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4007'19, HB 4008'19, HB 4014'19, HB 4016'19, HB 4009'19, HB 4012'19, HB 4013'19, HB 4010'19, HB 4015'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2019-03-19 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 24 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/09/2019 |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-03-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |