ME SP0683 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION SUPPORTING MAINE CEMENT MANUFACTURING AND OPPOSING SUBSIDIZED FOREIGN CEMENT IMPORTS
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION SUPPORTING MAINE CEMENT MANUFACTURING AND OPPOSING SUBSIDIZED FOREIGN CEMENT IMPORTS
Sponsors
Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. John Spear [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] |
Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Owen Casas [I] | Rep. Abden Simmons [R] | Rep. Paula Sutton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subsequently, the Joint Resolution was ADOPTED. |
2018-02-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-02-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-02-06 | House | On motion of Representative SANDERSON of Chelsea, TABLED pending ADOPTION. |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville REQUESTED a Roll Call. Less than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was NOT ORDERED. |
2018-02-06 | House | READ. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MIRAMANT of Knox READ and ADOPTED. |