ME LD943 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Cancellation of Subscription Services
Title
An Act Regarding the Cancellation of Subscription Services
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #232 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #129 (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #73 (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #129 (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #73 (Y: 83 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 232V 80 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-05 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 129 Yeas 10 - Nays 22 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-04 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-04 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 73 (Yeas 83 - Nays 59 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-04 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |