ME LD942 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Waive Professional and Occupational Licensing Fees for Calendar Year 2020
Title
An Act To Waive Professional and Occupational Licensing Fees for Calendar Year 2020
Sponsors
Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. Meldon Carmichael [R] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Rep. Chad Grignon [R] |
Rep. Richard Mason [R] | Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. James Thorne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #242 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #155 (Y: 77 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #155 (Y: 77 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 242 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 155 (Yeas 77 - Nays 56 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |