ME LD919 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require an Operator To Provide Evidence of Liability Insurance or Financial Responsibility at the Scene of an Accident
Title
An Act To Require an Operator To Provide Evidence of Liability Insurance or Financial Responsibility at the Scene of an Accident
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-251), in concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-251) |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |