ME LD915 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Sales Tax Exemption for Certain Public Libraries To Include Sales by Those Libraries or Their Supporting Organizations
Title
An Act To Expand the Sales Tax Exemption for Certain Public Libraries To Include Sales by Those Libraries or Their Supporting Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Douglas Thomas [R] |
Rep. Paul Bennett [R] | Rep. Joseph Brooks [D] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] | Rep. Adam Goode [D] |
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-119), in concurrence. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-119) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-119). |
2013-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-05-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |