ME LD905 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Long-term Capital Gains from Income Tax for Certain Income Levels
Title
An Act To Exempt Long-term Capital Gains from Income Tax for Certain Income Levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #92 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Acc Report 'b' Ontp RC #90 (Y: 73 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Acc Report 'b' Ontp RC #90 (Y: 73 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 92 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Report B Ought Not to Pass ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 90 (Yeas 73 - Nays 64 - Absent 12 - Excused 1 vacant 1) |
2019-05-09 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, REPORT B Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-08 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-05-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |