ME LD87 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 87 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - LD 87 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Continue the Study of Long-term Care Facilities
Title
Resolve, To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Continue the Study of Long-term Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Carol McElwee [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #336 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #338 (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #203 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #36 (Y: 84 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #338 (Y: 128 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #203 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #36 (Y: 84 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | LD 87 In Senate, June 23, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 338V 128 having voted in the affirmative and 10 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 203 (Yeas 141 - Nays 4 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-10 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2015-06-10 | House | Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-09 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2015-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2015-06-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-173) thereto |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) READ On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-173) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-173) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-173) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. READ ONCE |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-05 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-77). |
2015-05-05 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-04-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-77). |
2015-04-28 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-23 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-77) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 36 (Yeas 84 - Nays 65 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-01-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-20 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |