ME LD864 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Teachers' Privacy While Delivering Remote Instruction
Title
An Act To Protect Teachers' Privacy While Delivering Remote Instruction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #358 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #262 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #262 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 358 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 262 (Yeas 82 - Nays 57 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committees on JUDICIARY In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |