ME LD734 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to the Sales Tax Exemption on Depreciable Equipment Used in Commercial Wood Harvesting
Title
An Act Relating to the Sales Tax Exemption on Depreciable Equipment Used in Commercial Wood Harvesting
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Dawn Hill [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] |
Rep. Adam Goode [D] | Rep. Brian Jones [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #316 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Enactment RC #164 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #153 (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Enactment RC #164 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #153 (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (S.P. 272) (L.D. 734) "An Act Relating to the Sales Tax Exemption on Depreciable Equipment Used in Commercial Wood Harvesting" In Senate, June 18, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in favor and 15 against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (24 -Yeas, 11 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 164 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-99). |
2013-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 153 (Yeas 85 - Nays 55 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-30 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-30 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-28 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-28 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-99). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-99) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-28 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2013-02-28 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |