ME LD697 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance the Energy Security of Maine Residents
Title
An Act To Enhance the Energy Security of Maine Residents
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - Adopt Hah-1001 To Cah-935 RC #559 (Y: 79 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #748 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #526 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #748 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #526 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-935) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1001) thereto. |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-935) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-1001) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 559 (Yeas 79 - Nays 54 - Absent 14 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-13 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-1001) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-935) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECEDED. |
2022-04-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2022-04-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2022-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 748 Yeas 30 - Nays 1 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-935). |
2022-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-935) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 526 (Yeas 78 - Nays 58 - Absent 11 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-02 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 2, 2021. |