ME LD691 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Farms and Address Food Insecurity
Title
An Act To Support Farms and Address Food Insecurity
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #294 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-01 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-01 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-374) thereto. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-374) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-374) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-374) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) was ADOPTED |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 294 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-487). |
2021-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-487) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative O'NEIL of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-02 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 2, 2021. |