ME LD690 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Efficiency in the Unemployment Insurance System
Title
An Act To Ensure Efficiency in the Unemployment Insurance System
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
Rep. James Campbell [R] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. Megan Rochelo [D] |
Rep. Charles Theriault [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #215 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #245 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #245 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Report Accepted |
2014-01-23 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York Tabled pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-01-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-16 | House | Representative ROTUNDO from the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-10 | Senate | (18 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Number 215 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280). |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 245 (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-03 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-03 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |