ME LD639 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Develop Training for School Counselors and Review Limitations on Autism Spectrum Disorder Course Work for Special Education Certification
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Develop Training for School Counselors and Review Limitations on Autism Spectrum Disorder Course Work for Special Education Certification
Sponsors
Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] |
Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-365). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-01 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 1, 2021. |