ME LD619 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine Regarding Early Voting
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine Regarding Early Voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #103 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #27 (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #27 (Y: 85 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken. |
2019-05-23 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) in concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 103 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senator LUCHINI of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-28 | House | The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42). |
2019-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-03-28 | House | The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 27 (Yeas 85 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 2) |
2019-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |