ME LD614 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Electric Vehicles in Maine
Title
An Act To Increase Electric Vehicles in Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #118 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #110 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #110 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-300) in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-300) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 118 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-300). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-300) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 110 (Yeas 85 - Nays 58 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |