ME LD603 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Practice of Pharmacy
Title
An Act Regarding the Practice of Pharmacy
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] |
Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Sen. Harold Stewart [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-05-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |