ME LD594 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Labor To Submit to the United States Secretary of Labor a Plan for a Self-employment Assistance Program
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Labor To Submit to the United States Secretary of Labor a Plan for a Self-employment Assistance Program
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Michael Brennan [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] |
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-03-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |