ME LD559 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 27 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 27 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change Document Filing and Copying Fees for County Registries of Deeds
Title
An Act To Change Document Filing and Copying Fees for County Registries of Deeds
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Morrison [D] | Rep. Paulette Beaudoin [D] | Rep. Roberta Beavers [D] | Rep. Paul Bennett [R] |
Rep. James Campbell [R] | Rep. Alan Casavant [D] | Rep. Bryan Kaenrath [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #351 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #413 (Y: 107 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #292 (Y: 101 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #413 (Y: 107 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #292 (Y: 101 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | 27 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 351 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-26 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-26 | Senate | EnactmentIn Senate, June 14, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 27 in the Affirmative and 8 in the Nagative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2013-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 413V 107 having voted in the affirmative and 39 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2013-06-26 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-445), in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-445) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-445). |
2013-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-445) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 292 (Yeas 101 - Nays 48 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-12 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton REMOVED. |
2013-06-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |