ME LD540 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-13 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-13 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Promote Forest Certification and Long-term Forest Management
Title
An Act To Promote Forest Certification and Long-term Forest Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-13 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2009-05-18 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-05-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) in concurrence | |
2009-05-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-209) | |
2009-05-06 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Bliss of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |