ME LD533 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-10 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-10 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Joint Standing Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs To Report Out Legislation Regarding the Expansion of Slot Machine and Casino-style Gambling
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Joint Standing Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs To Report Out Legislation Regarding the Expansion of Slot Machine and Casino-style Gambling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-06-10 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-03 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-06-01 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-391) in concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-391) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-391) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 123 23 Yeas - 11 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-28 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-391) Report in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-391) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |