ME LD476 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Licensed Assisted Living and Nursing Facilities Levels of Care for Incarcerated Persons
Title
An Act To Provide Licensed Assisted Living and Nursing Facilities Levels of Care for Incarcerated Persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-16 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 11, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=476&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0350&item=1&snum=130 |