ME LD455 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - LD 455 In Senate, May 12, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - LD 455 In Senate, May 12, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Deceptive Practices Regarding Negotiable Instruments
Title
An Act To Prohibit Deceptive Practices Regarding Negotiable Instruments
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] |
Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #64 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | LD 455 In Senate, May 12, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 15 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2015-04-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-17). |
2015-04-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-17). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-17) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-02-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2015-02-24 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |