ME LD45 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Concerning the Ownership of a Causeway on Long Lake near St. Agatha
Title
Resolve, Concerning the Ownership of a Causeway on Long Lake near St. Agatha
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #268 (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #232 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #232 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 268V 81 having voted in the affirmative and 65 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-06-07 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-06-07 | Senate | LD 45 In Senate, June 7, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-88). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-88) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-01-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |