ME LD442 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Create the Office of Lieutenant Governor
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Create the Office of Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-11 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 11, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=442&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0318&item=1&snum=130 |