ME LD417 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine's Drivers from Pretextual Traffic Stops
Title
An Act To Protect Maine's Drivers from Pretextual Traffic Stops
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #393 (Y: 68 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #385 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #292 (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #385 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #292 (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 393V 68 having voted in the affirmative and 75 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-623) in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-623) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 385 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-623). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-623) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 292 (Yeas 72 - Nays 67 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered: TABLED |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |