ME LD401 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Creating a Probationary Period for County Corrections Officials
Title
An Act Creating a Probationary Period for County Corrections Officials
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Blodgett [D] | Sen. Gerald Davis [R] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] |
Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Rep. Veronica Magnan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-81) in concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-81) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-16 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-81) | |
2009-04-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |