ME LD396 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Elephants in Traveling Animal Acts
Title
An Act To Prohibit the Use of Elephants in Traveling Animal Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #160 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #137 (Y: 68 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #137 (Y: 68 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 160 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 137 (Yeas 68 - Nays 77 - Absent 4 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-23 | House | Motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2017-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |