ME LD386 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Establish the Process for Transitioning the Provision of Early Childhood Special Education Services for Children with Disabilities from 4 Years of Age to under 6 Years of Age from the Regional Child Development Services System to School Administrative Units
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education To Establish the Process for Transitioning the Provision of Early Childhood Special Education Services for Children with Disabilities from 4 Years of Age to under 6 Years of Age from the Regional Child Development Services System to School Administrative Units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-598) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-598) thereto. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-598) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-598) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-506). |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-506). |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE. |
2021-06-14 | House | Representative DUNPHY of Old Town REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2021-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) in concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-506). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-506) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 8, 2021. |