ME LD347 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate Maine's Climate Goals by Encouraging Use of Electric Vehicles
Title
An Act To Facilitate Maine's Climate Goals by Encouraging Use of Electric Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Recede And Concur RC #390 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #300 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #300 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 390 (Yeas 81 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto. |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) was ADOPTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED |
2021-06-18 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 584. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 300 (Yeas 84 - Nays 55 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-04 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021. |