ME LD27 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide an Immediate Opportunity To Appeal for a Juvenile Bound Over into Criminal Court
Title
An Act To Provide an Immediate Opportunity To Appeal for a Juvenile Bound Over into Criminal Court
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-15). |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-15). |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-15) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-02-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |