ME LD240 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Direct the Maine Connectivity Authority to Develop Proposed Legislation to Increase Broadband Internet Access
Title
Resolve, to Direct the Maine Connectivity Authority to Develop Proposed Legislation to Increase Broadband Internet Access
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] | Rep. James Boyle [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] |
Rep. Valli Geiger [D] | Rep. Ann Matlack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-798), in concurrence. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-798) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-798). |
2024-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered: TABLED |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2023-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |