ME LD2285 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education to Establish the Commission to Study School Construction Policy and Funding
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Education to Establish the Commission to Study School Construction Policy and Funding
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #480 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE Pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Elected Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 480 (Yeas 93 - Nays 47 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-09 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2024-04-09 | House | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2024-04-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2024-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported by Representative BRENNAN for the Joint Standing Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs pursuant to Public Law 2023, chapter 462, section 4. |