ME LD228 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise Notification Requirements for Pesticide Application
Title
An Act To Revise Notification Requirements for Pesticide Application
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 99 (Yeas 79 - Nays 69 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-06-01 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 98 (Yeas 73 - Nays 75 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Motion of Representative DILL of Old Town to suspend of the rules for the purpose of RECONSIDERATION FAILED. | |
2011-05-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) in concurrence | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) ADOPTED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Motion by Senator SCHNEIDER of Penobscot to adopt Senate Amendment "B" (S-160) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) READ (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 111 14 Yeas - 21 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) READ | |
2011-05-25 | (S) read once | |
2011-05-25 | (S) Taken from the table by the President ProTem On motion by Senator SHERMAN of Aroostook Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) READ and accepted in concurrence Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made) Roll Call # 110 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2011-05-23 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator SHERMAN of Aroostook Tabled Later Today Assigned pending motion by Same Senator to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report in concurrence Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-244). | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-244) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 61 (Yeas 81 - Nays 68 - Absent 1 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Representative EDGECOMB of Caribou moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Sherman of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |