ME LD2258 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 782 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 782 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Create an Income Tax Credit for Investments in a Team's Qualified Minor League Baseball Facility to Keep the Team in the State
Title
An Act to Create an Income Tax Credit for Investments in a Team's Qualified Minor League Baseball Facility to Keep the Team in the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #782 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #536 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #527 (Y: 56 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - Reconsider Minority Ontp Report RC #526 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #517 (Y: 62 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #719 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #536 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #527 (Y: 56 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - House - Reconsider Minority Ontp Report RC #526 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #517 (Y: 62 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #719 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 782 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 536 (Yeas 92 - Nays 52 - Absent 6 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-704). |
2024-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-704) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-16 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 527 (Yeas 56 - Nays 90 - Absent 4 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-16 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2024-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 526 (Yeas 105 - Nays 41 - Absent 4 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-15 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor. |
2024-04-15 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2024-04-15 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 517 (Yeas 62 - Nays 78 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-15 | House | Motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2024-04-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-704) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-704) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 719 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |