ME LD2176 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure the Workers' Compensation Board's Allocations Are Properly Funded
Title
An Act to Ensure the Workers' Compensation Board's Allocations Are Properly Funded
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #417 (Y: 76 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #600 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #600 (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2024-05-10 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-575). |
2024-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-575) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-20 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 417 (Yeas 76 - Nays 58 - Absent 17 - Excused 0) |
2024-03-20 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-575) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-575) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 600 Yeas 19 - Nays 12 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-03-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-575) Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tipping of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on Labor and Housing and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Reported by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot for the Workers' Compensation Board pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 39-A, section 152, subsection 11. |