ME LD2076 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Exempt from Excise Tax Vehicles of Active Duty Service Members Deployed Out-of-state
Title
An Act to Exempt from Excise Tax Vehicles of Active Duty Service Members Deployed Out-of-state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-812), in concurrence. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-812) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-812). |
2024-03-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2023-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2023. |