ME LD20 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Need for and the Costs of Services That Enable Populations Who Are Elderly or Have Disabilities To Live Independently
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Review the Need for and the Costs of Services That Enable Populations Who Are Elderly or Have Disabilities To Live Independently
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-03-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-01-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-15 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-01-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-01-15 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS |