ME LD1995 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Bolster Maine's Workforce and Economy by Increasing Assistance for Parents Pursuing Education and Employment and by Indexing Unemployment Benefits to the Unemployment Rate
Title
An Act to Bolster Maine's Workforce and Economy by Increasing Assistance for Parents Pursuing Education and Employment and by Indexing Unemployment Benefits to the Unemployment Rate
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Stewart [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Kathy Javner [R] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2024-01-25 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2024-01-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Senator LAWRENCE of York asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw the motion for a Roll Call. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION Roll Call Ordered |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved to RECEDE and CONCUR With REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to INSIST To REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING |
2023-05-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-23 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2023-05-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1995&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0820&item=1&snum=131 |