ME LD1979 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Development of Comprehensive River Resource Management Plans
Title
An Act Regarding the Development of Comprehensive River Resource Management Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Kevin O'Connell [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Poirier [R] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) thereto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) was READ. |
2022-04-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) thereto |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-563) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) READ |
2022-04-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-520) Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-04-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed |