ME LD1961 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Help Alleviate Maine's Housing Shortage and Change the Membership of the Maine State Housing Authority
Title
An Act To Help Alleviate Maine's Housing Shortage and Change the Membership of the Maine State Housing Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #522 (Y: 76 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #700 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #700 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-498). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-498) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 522 (Yeas 76 - Nays 52 - Absent 19 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-498) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-498) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 700 Yeas 20 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 3, 2022 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |