ME LD1938 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Discriminatory Practices Related to the 340B Drug Pricing Program
Title
An Act To Prohibit Discriminatory Practices Related to the 340B Drug Pricing Program
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1938&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0673&item=1&snum=130 |