ME LD1927 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 808 Yeas 15 - Nays 14 - Excused 5 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 808 Yeas 15 - Nays 14 - Excused 5 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Certain Off-premises Sales of Adult Use Marijuana Products
Title
An Act To Authorize Certain Off-premises Sales of Adult Use Marijuana Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #808 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #738 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #738 (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 808 Yeas 15 - Nays 14 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) in concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 738 Yeas 30 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-965). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-965) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2022-01-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 18, 2022. |