ME LD1923 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 726 Yeas 23 - Nays 7 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 726 Yeas 23 - Nays 7 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Maine Space Corporation
Title
An Act To Establish the Maine Space Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Janice Dodge [D] |
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Enactment RC #726 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 726 Yeas 23 - Nays 7 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-502) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 18, 2022 and REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |