ME LD1915 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Which Municipalities May Receive a Portion of Day Use and Camping Fees from State Parks and Historic Sites
Title
An Act To Clarify Which Municipalities May Receive a Portion of Day Use and Camping Fees from State Parks and Historic Sites
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #725 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 725V 86 having voted in the affirmative and 56 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-06-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Motion by Same Senator asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to INSIST |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved The Senate INSIST |
2018-06-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-25 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville under suspension of the Rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the House voted to RECEDE AND CONCUR. |
2018-06-25 | House | Bill RECALLED From Legislative Files (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1359) |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules and WITHOUT REFERENCE to a Committee, the Bill was READ TWICE and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed. |