ME LD1889 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Whistleblowers' Protection Act To Ensure Coverage in Unionized Workplaces
Title
An Act To Amend the Whistleblowers' Protection Act To Ensure Coverage in Unionized Workplaces
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #633 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 633 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-02-15 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |